VLADIMIR GOLINSKYI
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
27.02.2019 |
Adresa: |
Sofia, Stolična, Vitosa 15 |
|
VLADIMIR GOLINSKYI
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
27.02.2019 |
Adresa: |
Sofia, Stolična, Vitosa 15, Vitosa 15, Sofia, Stolična, Bulharsko |
|
ANATOLIJ LOBOZ
|
Neaktivní
od 27.02.2019
|
Jednatel |
09.01.2019 |
Adresa: |
Medzilaborce, Borov 4 |
|
ANATOLIJ LOBOZ
|
Neaktivní
od 27.02.2019
|
Jednatel |
09.01.2019 |
Adresa: |
Medzilaborce, Borov 4, Borov 4, Medzilaborce, Slovensko |
|
ANDRIY SADOVNYK
|
Neaktivní
od 09.01.2019
|
Jednatel |
23.05.2015 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21714487, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Nové Město, Nekázanka, 2037, 6 |
|
ANDRIY SADOVNYK
|
Neaktivní
od 09.01.2019
|
Jednatel |
23.05.2015 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21714487, Praha, Nové Město, Nekázanka, 2037, 6, Nekázanka 2037/6, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|
ANDRIY SADOVNYK
|
Neaktivní
od 23.05.2015
|
Jednatel |
30.07.2013 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21714487, Praha 1, Nové Město, Nekázanka, 2037, 6 |
|
Oleksandr Liakhovets
|
Neaktivní
od 09.01.2019
|
Jednatel |
30.07.2013 |
Adresa: |
03148, Kyjev, Generala Potapova 4/13 |
|
Denys Kyselov
|
Neaktivní
od 09.01.2019
|
Jednatel |
30.07.2013 |
Adresa: |
84101, Slovjansk, Zaporizka 59 |
|
ANDRIY SADOVNYK
|
Neaktivní
od 23.05.2015
|
Jednatel |
30.07.2013 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21714487, Praha, Nové Město, Nekázanka, 2037, 6, Nekázanka 2037/6, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|
Oleksandr Liakhovets
|
Neaktivní
od 09.01.2019
|
Jednatel |
30.07.2013 |
Adresa: |
Kyjev, Generala Potapova 4/13, 03148, Generala Potapova 4/13, 03148 Kyjev, Ukrajina |
|
Denys Kyselov
|
Neaktivní
od 09.01.2019
|
Jednatel |
30.07.2013 |
Adresa: |
Slovjansk, Zaporizka 59, 84101, Zaporizka 59, 84101 Slovjansk, Ukrajina |
|