VÍTĚZSLAV HEZKÝ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
07.10.2015 |
Adresa: |
47107, 13097687, Žandov, Žandov, Dlouhá, 110 |
|
VÍTĚZSLAV HEZKÝ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
07.10.2015 |
Adresa: |
47107, 13097687, Česká Lípa, Žandov, Žandov, Dlouhá, 110, Dlouhá 110, 47107 Žandov |
|
TOMÁŠ NOSEK
|
Neaktivní
od 30.11.2020
|
jednatel |
07.10.2015 |
Adresa: |
47006, 23484781, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, Pod Špičákem, 2710 |
|
TOMÁŠ NOSEK
|
Neaktivní
od 30.11.2020
|
jednatel |
07.10.2015 |
Adresa: |
47006, 23484781, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, Pod Špičákem, 2710, Pod Špičákem 2710, 47006 Česká Lípa |
|
TOMÁŠ NOSEK
|
Neaktivní
od 07.10.2015
|
jednatel |
11.11.2013 |
Adresa: |
47001, 25246119, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, náměstí T. G. Masaryka, 1, 1 |
|
TOMÁŠ NOSEK
|
Neaktivní
od 07.10.2015
|
jednatel |
11.11.2013 |
Adresa: |
47001, 25246119, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, náměstí T. G. Masaryka, 1, 1, náměstí T. G. Masaryka 1/1, 47001 Česká Lípa |
|
TOMÁŠ NOSEK
|
Neaktivní
od 11.11.2013
|
jednatel |
15.10.2013 |
Adresa: |
47001, 23479884, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, Okružní, 2218 |
|
VÍTĚZSLAV HEZKÝ
|
Neaktivní
od 07.10.2015
|
jednatel |
15.10.2013 |
Adresa: |
47107, 13097687, Žandov, Žandov, Dlouhá, 110 |
|
TOMÁŠ NOSEK
|
Neaktivní
od 11.11.2013
|
jednatel |
15.10.2013 |
Adresa: |
47001, 23479884, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, Česká Lípa, Okružní, 2218, Okružní 2218, 47001 Česká Lípa |
|
VÍTĚZSLAV HEZKÝ
|
Neaktivní
od 07.10.2015
|
jednatel |
15.10.2013 |
Adresa: |
47107, 13097687, Česká Lípa, Žandov, Žandov, Dlouhá, 110, Dlouhá 110, 47107 Žandov |
|