IVAN MILČIĆ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
21.07.2020 |
Adresa: |
Vir, Miljkovica VI 3 |
|
IVAN MILČIĆ
|
Neaktivní
od 13.10.2023
|
jednatel |
21.07.2020 |
Adresa: |
Vir, Miljkovica VI 3, Miljkovica VI 3, Vir, Chorvatsko |
|
Finesta Czech Republic, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 21.07.2020
|
Jednatel |
26.02.2017 |
Adresa: |
11800, 21698333, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Malá Strana, Tržiště, 372, 1 |
|
Finesta Czech Republic, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 21.07.2020
|
Jednatel |
26.02.2017 |
Adresa: |
11800, 21698333, Praha, Malá Strana, Tržiště, 372, 1, Tržiště 372/1, Malá Strana, 11800 Praha 1 |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 26.02.2017
|
Jednatel |
26.09.2016 |
Adresa: |
11800, 21698333, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Malá Strana, Tržiště, 372, 1 |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 26.02.2017
|
Jednatel |
26.09.2016 |
Adresa: |
11800, 21698333, Praha, Malá Strana, Tržiště, 372, 1, Tržiště 372/1, Malá Strana, 11800 Praha 1 |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 26.09.2016
|
Jednatel |
16.09.2016 |
Adresa: |
11800, 21698333, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Malá Strana, Tržiště, 372, 1 |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 26.09.2016
|
Jednatel |
16.09.2016 |
Adresa: |
11800, 21698333, Praha, Malá Strana, Tržiště, 372, 1, Tržiště 372/1, Malá Strana, 11800 Praha 1 |
|
ROMANA CHLÁDKOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 16.09.2016
|
jednatel |
12.08.2015 |
Adresa: |
66434, 24193364, Kuřim, Kuřim, Nádražní, 1260, 7 |
|
ROMANA CHLÁDKOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 16.09.2016
|
jednatel |
12.08.2015 |
Adresa: |
66434, 24193364, Brno-venkov, Kuřim, Kuřim, Nádražní, 1260, 7, Nádražní 1260/7, 66434 Kuřim |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 16.09.2016
|
Jednatel |
10.04.2015 |
Adresa: |
13000, 27627462, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Žižkov, Pitterova, 2855, 11 |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 16.09.2016
|
Jednatel |
10.04.2015 |
Adresa: |
13000, 27627462, Praha, Žižkov, Pitterova, 2855, 11, Pitterova 2855/11, Žižkov, 13000 Praha 3 |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 10.04.2015
|
Jednatel |
23.07.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21706387, Praha 1, Nové Město, Václavské náměstí, 832, 19 |
|
FINESTA GROUP, a.s.
27705854 |
Neaktivní
od 10.04.2015
|
Jednatel |
23.07.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21706387, Praha, Nové Město, Václavské náměstí, 832, 19, Václavské náměstí 832/19, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|