CARLA MASSI
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
11.09.2020 |
Adresa: |
00133, Roma, Via Braque 14 |
|
CARLA MASSI
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
11.09.2020 |
Adresa: |
Roma, Via Braque 14, 00133, Via Braque 14, 00133 Roma, Itálie |
|
LUCA D´ERRICO
|
Neaktivní
od 11.09.2020
|
Jednatel |
17.06.2019 |
Adresa: |
21040, Origgio, via Dante Alighieri 81 |
|
LUCA D´ERRICO
|
Neaktivní
od 11.09.2020
|
Jednatel |
17.06.2019 |
Adresa: |
Origgio, via Dante Alighieri 81, 21040, via Dante Alighieri 81, 21040 Origgio, Itálie |
|
ALESSANDRO ALAGIA
|
Neaktivní
od 17.06.2019
|
Jednatel |
10.04.2018 |
Adresa: |
68601, 18957153, Uherské Hradiště, Uherské Hradiště, Uherské Hradiště, Leoše Janáčka, 180 |
|
ALESSANDRO ALAGIA
|
Neaktivní
od 17.06.2019
|
Jednatel |
10.04.2018 |
Adresa: |
68601, 18957153, Uherské Hradiště, Uherské Hradiště, Uherské Hradiště, Leoše Janáčka, 180, Leoše Janáčka 180, 68601 Uherské Hradiště |
|
PIERANGELO SCALVINI
|
Neaktivní
od 10.04.2018
|
jednatel |
02.03.2015 |
Adresa: |
76005, 27965147, Zlín, Zlín, Pod Křiby, 5630 |
|
Pierangelo Scalvini
|
Neaktivní
od 10.04.2018
|
jednatel |
02.03.2015 |
Adresa: |
76005, 27965147, Zlín, Zlín, Zlín, Pod Křiby, 5630, Pod Křiby 5630, 76005 Zlín |
|
RTB company s.r.o.
24310115 |
Neaktivní
od 02.03.2015
|
jednatel |
22.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21711640, Praha 1, Nové Město, Krakovská, 1392, 7 |
|
RTB company s.r.o.
24310115 |
Neaktivní
od 02.03.2015
|
jednatel |
22.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21711640, Praha, Nové Město, Krakovská, 1392, 7, Krakovská 1392/7, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|