MIROSLAV VOKURKA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
24.06.2021 |
Adresa: |
25228, 77813596, Praha-západ, Černošice, Černošice, Foglarova, 2354 |
|
MIROSLAV VOKURKA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
24.06.2021 |
Adresa: |
25228, 77813596, Praha-západ, Černošice, Černošice, Foglarova, 2354, Foglarova 2354, 25228 Černošice |
|
MIROSLAV VOKURKA
|
Neaktivní
od 24.06.2021
|
jednatel |
18.10.2017 |
Adresa: |
25228, 25698508, Praha-západ, Černošice, Černošice, Peroutkova, 1854 |
|
MIROSLAV VOKURKA
|
Neaktivní
od 24.06.2021
|
jednatel |
18.10.2017 |
Adresa: |
25228, 25698508, Praha-západ, Černošice, Černošice, Peroutkova, 1854, Peroutkova 1854, 25228 Černošice |
|
MIROSLAV VOKURKA
|
Neaktivní
od 18.10.2017
|
jednatel |
23.06.2016 |
Adresa: |
25228, 6529704, Praha-západ, Černošice, Černošice, Olbrachtova, 2010 |
|
ALEŠ GROLL
|
Neaktivní
od 18.04.2019
|
jednatel |
23.06.2016 |
Adresa: |
25229, 26143071, Praha-západ, Dobřichovice, Dobřichovice, Všenorská, 785 |
|
MIROSLAV VOKURKA
|
Neaktivní
od 18.10.2017
|
jednatel |
23.06.2016 |
Adresa: |
25228, 6529704, Praha-západ, Černošice, Černošice, Olbrachtova, 2010, Olbrachtova 2010, 25228 Černošice |
|
ALEŠ GROLL
|
Neaktivní
od 18.04.2019
|
jednatel |
23.06.2016 |
Adresa: |
25229, 26143071, Praha-západ, Dobřichovice, Dobřichovice, Všenorská, 785, Všenorská 785, 25229 Dobřichovice |
|