Ing. CYRILL CHVOJKA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
09.06.2023 |
Adresa: |
15300, 22051775, Praha, Radotín, Strážovská, 705, 34, Strážovská 705/34, Radotín, 15300 Praha 5 |
|
CYRILL CHVOJKA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
05.09.2019 |
Adresa: |
15300, 22051775, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Radotín, Strážovská, 705, 34 |
|
Ing. MAREK FLORIÁN
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
02.10.2018 |
Adresa: |
25801, 3100936, Benešov, Vracovice, Vracovice, 65 |
|
Ing. MAREK FLORIÁN
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
02.10.2018 |
Adresa: |
25801, 3100936, Benešov, Vracovice, Vracovice, 65, č.p. 65, 25801 Vracovice |
|
JAN KUDĚJ
|
Neaktivní
od 10.03.2022
|
jednatel |
04.04.2021 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22086871, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Smíchov, Na Březince, 1160, 12 |
|
JAN KUDĚJ
|
Neaktivní
od 10.03.2022
|
jednatel |
04.04.2021 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22086871, Praha, Smíchov, Na Březince, 1160, 12, Na Březince 1160/12, Smíchov, 15000 Praha 5 |
|
JAN KUDĚJ
|
Neaktivní
od 04.04.2021
|
jednatel |
24.10.2019 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22024964, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Košíře, Slávy Horníka, 661, 37 |
|
JAN KUDĚJ
|
Neaktivní
od 04.04.2021
|
jednatel |
24.10.2019 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22024964, Praha, Košíře, Slávy Horníka, 661, 37, Slávy Horníka 661/37, Košíře, 15000 Praha 5 |
|
JAN KUDĚJ
|
Neaktivní
od 24.10.2019
|
jednatel |
05.09.2019 |
Adresa: |
38711, 8961751, Strakonice, Katovice, Katovice, Nádražní, 150 |
|
JAN KUDĚJ
|
Neaktivní
od 24.10.2019
|
jednatel |
05.09.2019 |
Adresa: |
38711, 8961751, Strakonice, Katovice, Katovice, Nádražní, 150, Nádražní 150, 38711 Katovice |
|
CYRILL CHVOJKA
|
Neaktivní
od 09.06.2023
|
jednatel |
05.09.2019 |
Adresa: |
15300, 22051775, Praha, Radotín, Strážovská, 705, 34, Strážovská 705/34, Radotín, 15300 Praha 5 |
|