VASYLYNA VIRVAN
|
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
18.03.2023 |
Adresa: |
Čop, Zaliznyčniykiv 2/113, 89500, Zaliznyčniykiv 2/113, 89500 Čop, Ukrajina |
|
Valuation and Investment s.r.o.
05780497 |
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
30.12.2022 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22080724, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Smíchov, Jindřicha Plachty, 596, 8 |
|
Valuation and Investment s.r.o.
05780497 |
Neaktivní
od 18.03.2023
|
Jednatel |
30.12.2022 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22080724, Praha, Smíchov, Jindřicha Plachty, 596, 8, Jindřicha Plachty 596/8, Smíchov, 15000 Praha 5 |
|
BizDirector, s.r.o.
08085242 |
Neaktivní
od 30.12.2022
|
Jednatel |
25.11.2022 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22650822, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Vinohrady, Korunní, 1208, 74 |
|
BizDirector, s.r.o.
08085242 |
Neaktivní
od 30.12.2022
|
Jednatel |
25.11.2022 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22650822, Praha, Vinohrady, Korunní, 1208, 74, Korunní 1208/74, Vinohrady, 10100 Praha 10 |
|
KAMIL NĚMEC
|
Neaktivní
od 25.11.2022
|
Jednatel |
04.06.2022 |
Adresa: |
25064, 74168207, Praha-východ, Zlonín, Zlonín, Javorová, 266, 4 |
|
KAMIL NĚMEC
|
Neaktivní
od 25.11.2022
|
Jednatel |
04.06.2022 |
Adresa: |
25064, 74168207, Praha-východ, Zlonín, Zlonín, Javorová, 266, 4, Javorová 266/4, 25064 Zlonín |
|
KAMIL NĚMEC
|
Neaktivní
od 04.06.2022
|
Jednatel |
08.11.2019 |
Adresa: |
25064, 74168207, Praha-východ, Zlonín, Zlonín, 266 |
|
KAMIL NĚMEC
|
Neaktivní
od 04.06.2022
|
Jednatel |
08.11.2019 |
Adresa: |
25064, 74168207, Praha-východ, Zlonín, Zlonín, Javorová, 266, 4, Javorová 266/4, 25064 Zlonín |
|