MICHAIL IVANOVIČ JEGOROV
|
Aktivní
|
Supervisor |
02.02.2024 |
Adresa: |
10000, 22602011, Praha, Strašnice, Vilová, 266, 16, Vilová 266/16, Strašnice, 10000 Praha 10 |
|
MARTIN FRANCŮ
|
Aktivní
|
Vice President |
20.01.2021 |
Adresa: |
18600, 22353810, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Karlín, Březinova, 491, 15 |
|
MARTIN FRANCŮ
|
Aktivní
|
Vice President |
20.01.2021 |
Adresa: |
18600, 22353810, Praha, Karlín, Březinova, 491, 15, Březinova 491/15, Karlín, 18600 Praha 8 |
|
JONÁŠ VLASÁK
|
Aktivní
|
Chief Referee |
11.11.2020 |
Adresa: |
15800, 22011137, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Jinonice, V Roháčích, 74, 27 |
|
JONÁŠ VLASÁK
|
Aktivní
|
Chief Referee |
11.11.2020 |
Adresa: |
15800, 22011137, Praha, Jinonice, V Roháčích, 74, 27, V Roháčích 74/27, Jinonice, 15800 Praha 5 |
|
ONDŘEJ MERTA
|
Aktivní
|
President of the Association |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21795711, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Žižkov, Květinková, 2574, 13 |
|
DMYTRO BULGAKOV
|
Aktivní
|
Technical Director |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21725730, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Staré Město, Dušní, 928, 1 |
|
IVETA TRNKOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
Secretary-General |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
27201, 1438875, Kladno, Kladno, Kročehlavy, Pařížská, 2508 |
|
MYKHAILO YEHOROV
|
Aktivní
|
Supervisor |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21768102, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Žižkov, Husitská, 106, 1 |
|
ONDŘEJ MERTA
|
Aktivní
|
President of the Association |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21795711, Praha, Žižkov, Květinková, 2574, 13, Květinková 2574/13, Žižkov, 13000 Praha 3 |
|
DMYTRO BULGAKOV
|
Aktivní
|
Technical Director |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21725730, Praha, Staré Město, Dušní, 928, 1, Dušní 928/1, Staré Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|
IVETA TRNKOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
Secretary-General |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
27201, 1438875, Kladno, Kladno, Kročehlavy, Pařížská, 2508, Pařížská 2508, Kročehlavy, 27201 Kladno |
|
MYKHAILO YEHOROV
|
Neaktivní
od 02.02.2024
|
Supervisor |
08.12.2023 |
Adresa: |
10000, 22602011, Praha, Strašnice, Vilová, 266, 16, Vilová 266/16, Strašnice, 10000 Praha 10 |
|
JONÁŠ VLASÁK
|
Neaktivní
od 11.11.2020
|
Chief Referee |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20735898, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Kolmá, 728, 34 |
|
MARTIN FRANCŮ
|
Neaktivní
od 20.01.2021
|
Vice President |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
61300, 19297807, Brno-město, Brno, Černá Pole, Merhautova, 941, 57 |
|
JONÁŠ VLASÁK
|
Neaktivní
od 11.11.2020
|
Chief Referee |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20735898, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Kolmá, 728, 34, Kolmá 728/34, 36001 Karlovy Vary |
|
MARTIN FRANCŮ
|
Neaktivní
od 20.01.2021
|
Vice President |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
61300, 19297807, Brno-město, Brno, Černá Pole, Merhautova, 941, 57, Merhautova 941/57, Černá Pole, 61300 Brno |
|
MYKHAILO YEHOROV
|
Neaktivní
od 08.12.2023
|
Supervisor |
15.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21768102, Praha, Žižkov, Husitská, 106, 1, Husitská 106/1, Žižkov, 13000 Praha 3 |
|