HAZEM SABRY FARAGALLA AWAD
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
08.03.2024 |
Adresa: |
15800, 26632730, Praha, Stodůlky, Smetáčkova, 1486, 6, Smetáčkova 1486/6, Stodůlky, 15800 Praha 5 |
|
IYAD H. M. ABUTAHA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
14.02.2024 |
Adresa: |
19016, 85879371, Praha, Újezd nad Lesy, Načešická, 2885, Načešická 2885, Újezd nad Lesy, 19016 Praha 9 |
|
IYAD H. M. ABUTAHA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
11.04.2022 |
Adresa: |
35301, 17708290, Cheb, Drmoul, Drmoul, Sekerská, 54 |
|
HAZEM SABRY FARAGALLA H. AWAD
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
03.08.2021 |
Adresa: |
15800, 26632730, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Stodůlky, Smetáčkova, 1486, 6 |
|
IYAD H. M. ABUTAHA
|
Neaktivní
od 14.02.2024
|
jednatel |
11.04.2022 |
Adresa: |
35301, 17708290, Cheb, Drmoul, Drmoul, Sekerská, 54, Sekerská 54, 35301 Drmoul |
|
MARIETA STEFANOVA AWAD
|
Neaktivní
od 11.04.2022
|
jednatel |
03.08.2021 |
Adresa: |
15800, 26632730, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Stodůlky, Smetáčkova, 1486, 6 |
|
MARIETA STEFANOVA AWAD
|
Neaktivní
od 11.04.2022
|
jednatel |
03.08.2021 |
Adresa: |
15800, 26632730, Praha, Stodůlky, Smetáčkova, 1486, 6, Smetáčkova 1486/6, Stodůlky, 15800 Praha 5 |
|
HAZEM SABRY FARAGALLA H. AWAD
|
Neaktivní
od 08.03.2024
|
jednatel |
03.08.2021 |
Adresa: |
15800, 26632730, Praha, Stodůlky, Smetáčkova, 1486, 6, Smetáčkova 1486/6, Stodůlky, 15800 Praha 5 |
|