FILKOPI SUPPORT s.r.o.
07566654 |
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
13.02.2023 |
Adresa: |
18600, 75789485, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Karlín, U Mlýnského kanálu, 687, 5 |
|
ISTVÁN KOPINEC
|
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
13.02.2023 |
Adresa: |
19700, 80698921, Praha, Kbely, Plzákova, 1138, 12 |
|
FILKOPI SUPPORT s.r.o.
07566654 |
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
13.02.2023 |
Adresa: |
18600, 75789485, Praha, Karlín, U Mlýnského kanálu, 687, 5, U Mlýnského kanálu 687/5, Karlín, 18600 Praha 8 |
|
ISTVÁN KOPINEC
|
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
13.02.2023 |
Adresa: |
19700, 80698921, Praha, Kbely, Plzákova, 1138, 12, Plzákova 1138/12, Kbely, 19700 Praha 9 |
|
MARTIN CHAMR
|
Neaktivní
od 13.02.2023
|
jednatel |
01.02.2022 |
Adresa: |
14000, 22708669, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Nusle, 5. května, 1660, 39 |
|
MARTIN CHAMR
|
Neaktivní
od 13.02.2023
|
jednatel |
01.02.2022 |
Adresa: |
14000, 22708669, Praha, Nusle, 5. května, 1660, 39, 5. května 1660/39, Nusle, 14000 Praha 4 |
|