Ing. LADISLAV HARTMAN
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
26.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
14200, 22725288, Praha, Krč, Šípková, 1866, 12 |
|
Ing. Ladislav Hartman
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
26.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
14200, 22725288, Praha, Krč, Šípková, 1866, 12, Šípková 1866/12, Krč, 14200 Praha 4 |
|
Ing. Ladislav Hartman
|
Neaktivní
od 26.11.2015
|
jednatel |
09.02.2009 |
Adresa: |
14200, 22725288, Praha 4, Krč, Šípková, 1866/12 |
|
Ing. Ladislav Hartman
|
Neaktivní
od 26.11.2015
|
jednatel |
09.02.2009 |
Adresa: |
14200, 22725288, Praha, Krč, Šípková, 1866, 12, Šípková 1866/12, Krč, 14200 Praha 4 |
|
Ing. Ladislav Hartman
|
Neaktivní
od 09.02.2009
|
jednatel |
04.06.2007 |
Adresa: |
Praha 10, Jahodová 2889/42, PSČ 106 00 |
|
Ing. Ladislav Hartman
|
Neaktivní
od 09.02.2009
|
jednatel |
04.06.2007 |
Adresa: |
10600, 22686703, Praha, Záběhlice, Jahodová, 2889, 42, Jahodová 2889/42, Záběhlice, 10600 Praha 10 |
|
Ing. Ladislav Hartman
|
Neaktivní
od 04.06.2007
|
jednatel |
13.10.1992 |
Adresa: |
22687874, Praha 10, Praha 10, Škábova, 3057 |
|
ing. Ladislav Hartman
|
Neaktivní
od 04.06.2007
|
jednatel |
13.10.1992 |
Adresa: |
10600, 22687874, Praha, Záběhlice, Škábova, 3057, 1, Škábova 3057/1, Záběhlice, 10600 Praha 10 |
|
Herbert Jochum
|
Neaktivní
od 13.10.1992
|
ředitel |
20.03.1991 |
Adresa: |
101, bytem Sachsenkamerstrasse 1, 8175 Greiling |
|
Herbert Jochum
|
Neaktivní
od 13.10.1992
|
ředitel |
20.03.1991 |
Adresa: |
bytem Sachsenkamerstrasse 1, 8175 Greiling |
|