Dmitry Dyachkovskiy
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
16.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
Juzno - Sahalinsk, Detskaja 8B |
|
KONSTANTIN FIRSTOV
|
Neaktivní
od 18.11.2021
|
jednatel |
02.09.2017 |
Adresa: |
17000, 22300007, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Holešovice, Letohradská, 501, 16 |
|
KONSTANTIN FIRSTOV
|
Neaktivní
od 18.11.2021
|
jednatel |
02.09.2017 |
Adresa: |
17000, 22300007, Praha, Holešovice, Letohradská, 501, 16, Letohradská 501/16, Holešovice, 17000 Praha 7 |
|
KONSTANTIN FIRSTOV
|
Neaktivní
od 02.09.2017
|
jednatel |
10.12.2015 |
Adresa: |
14000, 26223988, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Nusle, Mojmírova, 1710, 15 |
|
KONSTANTIN FIRSTOV
|
Neaktivní
od 02.09.2017
|
jednatel |
10.12.2015 |
Adresa: |
14000, 26223988, Praha, Nusle, Mojmírova, 1710, 15, Mojmírova 1710/15, Nusle, 14000 Praha 4 |
|
KONSTANTIN FIRSTOV
|
Neaktivní
od 10.12.2015
|
jednatel |
06.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
25301, 26059835, Hostivice, Hostivice, Bohuslavova, 2416 |
|
KONSTANTIN FIRSTOV
|
Neaktivní
od 10.12.2015
|
jednatel |
06.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
25301, 26059835, Praha-západ, Hostivice, Hostivice, Bohuslavova, 2416, Bohuslavova 2416, 25301 Hostivice |
|
Konstantin Firstov
|
Neaktivní
od 06.11.2015
|
jednatel |
16.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
25301, 26059835, Hostivice, Bohuslavova, 2416 |
|
KONSTANTIN FIRSTOV
|
Neaktivní
od 06.11.2015
|
jednatel |
16.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
25301, 26059835, Praha-západ, Hostivice, Hostivice, Bohuslavova, 2416, Bohuslavova 2416, 25301 Hostivice |
|