DAEHWAN KIM
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
17.03.2023 |
|
DAEHWAN KIM
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
09.06.2018 |
Adresa: |
19900, 77777948, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Letňany, Urubova, 829, 9 |
|
MI HYUN JEON
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
09.06.2018 |
Adresa: |
19900, 77777948, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Letňany, Urubova, 829, 9 |
|
MI HYUN JEON
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
09.06.2018 |
Adresa: |
19900, 77777948, Praha, Letňany, Urubova, 829, 9, Urubova 829/9, Letňany, 19900 Praha 9 |
|
DAEHWAN KIM
|
Neaktivní
od 17.03.2023
|
jednatel |
09.06.2018 |
Adresa: |
19900, 77777948, Praha, Letňany, Urubova, 829, 9, Urubova 829/9, Letňany, 19900 Praha 9 |
|
DAEHWAN KIM
|
Neaktivní
od 09.06.2018
|
jednatel |
04.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21712808, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Nové Město, Vladislavova, 1587, 24 |
|
MI HYUN JEON
|
Neaktivní
od 09.06.2018
|
jednatel |
04.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21712808, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Nové Město, Vladislavova, 1587, 24 |
|
MI HYUN JEON
|
Neaktivní
od 09.06.2018
|
jednatel |
04.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21712808, Praha, Nové Město, Vladislavova, 1587, 24, Vladislavova 1587/24, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|
DAEHWAN KIM
|
Neaktivní
od 09.06.2018
|
jednatel |
04.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21712808, Praha, Nové Město, Vladislavova, 1587, 24, Vladislavova 1587/24, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|
Daehwan KIM
|
Neaktivní
od 04.09.2014
|
jednatel |
09.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
Jeonju, Wansan-gu, Poongnam-dong 1 ga 30 |
|
Mi Hyun JEON
|
Neaktivní
od 04.09.2014
|
jednatel |
09.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
Soul, Dongdaemun-gu, Yongdu-dong 39/256 |
|