CE INVEST TRADE S.A.
|
Neaktivní
od 13.08.2020
|
jednatel |
14.03.2017 |
Adresa: |
Providence, Mahé, Rue de la Perle, Global Gateway 8 |
|
CE INVEST TRADE S.A.
|
Neaktivní
od 13.08.2020
|
jednatel |
14.03.2017 |
Adresa: |
Providence, Mahé, Rue de la Perle, Global Gateway 8, Rue de la Perle, Global Gateway 8, Providence, Mahé, Seychely |
|
JAN KONVALINKA
|
Neaktivní
od 14.03.2017
|
jednatel |
17.02.2016 |
Adresa: |
14900, 21839409, Praha, Chodov, Hněvkovského, 1387, 2 |
|
JAN KONVALINKA
|
Neaktivní
od 14.03.2017
|
jednatel |
17.02.2016 |
Adresa: |
14900, 21839409, Praha, Chodov, Hněvkovského, 1387, 2, Hněvkovského 1387/2, Chodov, 14900 Praha 4 |
|
JAN BARTOŠ
|
Neaktivní
od 17.02.2016
|
jednatel |
25.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21762805, Praha, Vinohrady, Vinohradská, 1784, 134 |
|
JAN HRMA
|
Neaktivní
od 17.02.2016
|
jednatel |
25.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22666745, Praha, Vršovice, 28. pluku, 1011, 14 |
|
JAN BARTOŠ
|
Neaktivní
od 17.02.2016
|
jednatel |
25.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21762805, Praha, Vinohrady, Vinohradská, 1784, 134, Vinohradská 1784/134, Vinohrady, 13000 Praha 3 |
|
JAN HRMA
|
Neaktivní
od 17.02.2016
|
jednatel |
25.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22666745, Praha, Vršovice, 28. pluku, 1011, 14, 28. pluku 1011/14, Vršovice, 10100 Praha 10 |
|
Jan Bartoš
|
Neaktivní
od 25.11.2015
|
jednatel |
28.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21762805, Praha 3, Vinohrady, Vinohradská, 1784, 134 |
|
Jan Hrma
|
Neaktivní
od 25.11.2015
|
jednatel |
28.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22666745, Praha 10, Vršovice, 28. pluku, 1011, 14 |
|
JAN BARTOŠ
|
Neaktivní
od 25.11.2015
|
jednatel |
28.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21762805, Praha, Vinohrady, Vinohradská, 1784, 134, Vinohradská 1784/134, Vinohrady, 13000 Praha 3 |
|
JAN HRMA
|
Neaktivní
od 25.11.2015
|
jednatel |
28.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22666745, Praha, Vršovice, 28. pluku, 1011, 14, 28. pluku 1011/14, Vršovice, 10100 Praha 10 |
|