YAROSLAV GORIN
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
07.06.2023 |
Adresa: |
29306, 73377805, Mladá Boleslav, Bradlec, Bradlec, Zelená, 140, Zelená 140, 29306 Bradlec |
|
STANISLAV HOVORKA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
07.06.2023 |
Adresa: |
29442, 77978838, Mladá Boleslav, Luštěnice, Zelená, Luční, 594, Luční 594, Zelená, 29442 Luštěnice |
|
OLEXANDR VASYK
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
25.02.2016 |
Adresa: |
29402, 74367978, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 34 |
|
OLEXANDR VASYK
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
25.02.2016 |
Adresa: |
29402, 74367978, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 34, Koprník 34, 29402 Kněžmost |
|
OLEXANDR VASYK
|
Neaktivní
od 25.02.2016
|
jednatel |
19.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13 |
|
YURIY SALAMATIN
|
Neaktivní
od 17.01.2022
|
jednatel |
19.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13 |
|
OLEXANDR VASYK
|
Neaktivní
od 25.02.2016
|
jednatel |
19.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13, Koprník 13, 29402 Kněžmost |
|
YURIY SALAMATIN
|
Neaktivní
od 17.01.2022
|
jednatel |
19.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13, Koprník 13, 29402 Kněžmost |
|
OLEKSANDR PETROVYČ SHYNKARENKO
|
Neaktivní
od 25.04.2013
|
jednatel |
25.04.2013 |
Adresa: |
Kyjev, richya Řovtnya 30a room 39, prospekt 40 |
|
OLEKSANDR SHYNKARENKO
|
Neaktivní
od 11.07.2022
|
jednatel |
25.04.2013 |
Adresa: |
Kyjev, richya Řovtnya 30a Room 39, Prospekt 40 |
|
OLEKSANDR PETROVYČ SHYNKARENKO
|
Neaktivní
od 25.04.2013
|
jednatel |
25.04.2013 |
Adresa: |
Kyjev, richya Řovtnya 30a room 39, prospekt 40, richya Řovtnya 30a room 39, prospekt 40, Kyjev, Ukrajina |
|
OLEKSANDR SHYNKARENKO
|
Neaktivní
od 11.07.2022
|
jednatel |
25.04.2013 |
Adresa: |
Kyjev, richya Řovtnya 30a Room 39, Prospekt 40, richya Řovtnya 30a Room 39, Prospekt 40, Kyjev, Ukrajina |
|
Olexandr Vasyk
|
Neaktivní
od 19.11.2015
|
jednatel |
01.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13 |
|
Yuriy Salamatin
|
Neaktivní
od 19.11.2015
|
jednatel |
01.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13 |
|
OLEXANDR VASYK
|
Neaktivní
od 19.11.2015
|
jednatel |
01.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13, Koprník 13, 29402 Kněžmost |
|
YURIY SALAMATIN
|
Neaktivní
od 19.11.2015
|
jednatel |
01.06.2012 |
Adresa: |
29402, 12609129, Mladá Boleslav, Kněžmost, Koprník, 13, Koprník 13, 29402 Kněžmost |
|
Jana Grossová
|
Neaktivní
od 01.06.2012
|
jednatel |
25.06.2010 |
Adresa: |
27303, 27947530, Stochov, Honice, U Topolu, 157 |
|
Jana Grossová
|
Neaktivní
od 01.06.2012
|
jednatel |
25.06.2010 |
Adresa: |
27303, 27947530, Kladno, Stochov, Honice, U Topolu, 157, U Topolu 157, Honice, 27303 Stochov |
|