MARCELA PEKÁRKOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
25.03.2021 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1028740, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, Kasejovice, 226 |
|
JAN PIŠINGER
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
25.03.2021 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1026658, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, Kasejovice, 16 |
|
MARCELA PEKÁRKOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
25.03.2021 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1028740, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, Kasejovice, 226, č.p. 226, 33544 Kasejovice |
|
JAN PIŠINGER
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
25.03.2021 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1026658, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, Kasejovice, 16, č.p. 16, 33544 Kasejovice |
|
Jan Pišinger
|
Neaktivní
od 22.11.2011
|
jednatel |
22.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1028740, Kasejovice, 226 |
|
Marcela Pekárková
|
Neaktivní
od 25.03.2021
|
jednatel |
22.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1028740, Kasejovice, 226 |
|
Jan Pišinger
|
Neaktivní
od 25.03.2021
|
jednatel |
22.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1026658, Kasejovice, 16 |
|
Jan Pišinger
|
Neaktivní
od 22.11.2011
|
jednatel |
22.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1028740, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, Kasejovice, 226, č.p. 226, 33544 Kasejovice |
|
MARCELA PEKÁRKOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 25.03.2021
|
jednatel |
22.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1028740, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, Kasejovice, 226, č.p. 226, 33544 Kasejovice |
|
JAN PIŠINGER
|
Neaktivní
od 25.03.2021
|
jednatel |
22.11.2011 |
Adresa: |
33544, 1026658, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, Kasejovice, 16, č.p. 16, 33544 Kasejovice |
|
Marcela Pekárková
|
Neaktivní
od 07.11.2002
|
jednatel |
07.11.2002 |
Adresa: |
33544, Plzeň-jih, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, 764 |
|
Marcela Pekárková
|
Neaktivní
od 22.11.2011
|
jednatel |
07.11.2002 |
Adresa: |
33544, Plzeň-jih, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, 226 |
|
Marcela Pekárková
|
Neaktivní
od 07.11.2002
|
jednatel |
07.11.2002 |
Adresa: |
764, Plzeň-jih, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, 33544, Kasejovice 764, 33544 Plzeň-jih, okres: Plzeň-jih, Česká republika |
|
Marcela Pekárková
|
Neaktivní
od 22.11.2011
|
jednatel |
07.11.2002 |
Adresa: |
226, Plzeň-jih, Plzeň-jih, Kasejovice, 33544, Kasejovice 226, 33544 Plzeň-jih, okres: Plzeň-jih, Česká republika |
|
Marcela Pekárková
|
Neaktivní
od 07.11.2002
|
jednatel |
14.08.1997 |
|
Marcela Pekárková
|
Neaktivní
od 07.11.2002
|
jednatel |
14.08.1997 |
Adresa: |
764, Bor, 39811, 39811 Bor 764, Česká republika |
|