EDEN HOTELS s.r.o.
64942406 |
Neaktivní
od 28.03.2019
|
jednatel |
01.06.2018 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20731337, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Na Vyhlídce, 93, 50 |
|
EDEN HOTELS s.r.o.
64942406 |
Neaktivní
od 28.03.2019
|
jednatel |
01.06.2018 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20731337, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Na Vyhlídce, 93, 50, Na Vyhlídce 93/50, 36001 Karlovy Vary |
|
Raiffeisen - Leasing, s.r.o.
61467863 |
Neaktivní
od 01.06.2018
|
jednatel |
09.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
14078, 27382800, Praha 4, Nusle, Hvězdova, 1716/2b |
|
Raiffeisen - Leasing, s.r.o.
61467863 |
Neaktivní
od 01.06.2018
|
jednatel |
09.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
14000, 27382800, Praha, Nusle, Hvězdova, 1716, 2b, Hvězdova 1716/2b, Nusle, 14000 Praha 4 |
|
Ing. JIŘÍ KRUNCL
|
Neaktivní
od 09.11.2015
|
jednatel |
16.07.2015 |
Adresa: |
10600, 22677062, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Záběhlice, Jesenická, 1410, 58 |
|
Ing. Jiří Kruncl
|
Neaktivní
od 09.11.2015
|
jednatel |
16.07.2015 |
Adresa: |
10600, 22677062, Praha, Záběhlice, Jesenická, 1410, 58, Jesenická 1410/58, Záběhlice, 10600 Praha 10 |
|
Ing. Jiří Kruncl
|
Neaktivní
od 16.07.2015
|
jednatel |
30.05.2012 |
Adresa: |
10600, 22677062, Praha 10, Záběhlice, Jesenická, 1410, 58 |
|
Ing. Jiří Kruncl
|
Neaktivní
od 16.07.2015
|
jednatel |
30.05.2012 |
Adresa: |
10600, 22677062, Praha, Záběhlice, Jesenická, 1410, 58, Jesenická 1410/58, Záběhlice, 10600 Praha 10 |
|
Jiří Kašek
|
Neaktivní
od 30.05.2012
|
jednatel |
29.07.2010 |
Adresa: |
16300, 26141833, Praha 6, Čistovická, 1700, 62 |
|
Jiří Kašek
|
Neaktivní
od 30.05.2012
|
jednatel |
29.07.2010 |
Adresa: |
16300, 26141833, Praha, Řepy, Čistovická, 1700, 62, Čistovická 1700/62, Řepy, 16300 Praha 6 |
|
Michal Mišek
|
Neaktivní
od 29.07.2010
|
jednatel |
18.11.2008 |
Adresa: |
19000, 22506632, Praha 9, Prosek, Litvínovská, 523/30 |
|
Michal Mišek
|
Neaktivní
od 29.07.2010
|
jednatel |
18.11.2008 |
Adresa: |
19000, 22506632, Praha, Prosek, Litvínovská, 523, 30, Litvínovská 523/30, Prosek, 19000 Praha 9 |
|
Mag. Alois Lanegger
|
Neaktivní
od 09.11.2015
|
Jednatel |
25.06.2004 |
Adresa: |
1020 Vídeň, Fruchtgasse 3 |
|
Romana Mrvová
|
Neaktivní
od 25.06.2004
|
Jednatel |
07.12.1999 |
Adresa: |
36301, Ostrov, Tylova, 742/17 |
|
Romana Mrvová
|
Neaktivní
od 25.06.2004
|
Jednatel |
07.12.1999 |
Adresa: |
36301, 12037010, Karlovy Vary, Ostrov, Ostrov, Tylova, 742, Tylova 742, 36301 Ostrov |
|