ZUZANA KOROUSOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
19.01.2023 |
Adresa: |
41156, 16621867, Litoměřice, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Pod Pivovarem, 6 |
|
ZUZANA KOROUSOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
19.01.2023 |
Adresa: |
41156, 16621867, Litoměřice, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Pod Pivovarem, 6, Pod Pivovarem 6, 41156 Bohušovice nad Ohří |
|
MARTIN KOROUS
|
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
19.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
41156, 16621867, Litoměřice, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Pod Pivovarem, 6 |
|
MARTIN KOROUS
|
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
19.06.2020 |
Adresa: |
41156, 16621867, Litoměřice, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Bohušovice nad Ohří, Pod Pivovarem, 6, Pod Pivovarem 6, 41156 Bohušovice nad Ohří |
|
MARTIN KOROUS
|
Neaktivní
od 19.06.2020
|
Jednatel |
10.06.2014 |
Adresa: |
41201, 2900556, Litoměřice, Předměstí, Pražská, 531, 12 |
|
MARTIN KOROUS
|
Neaktivní
od 19.06.2020
|
Jednatel |
10.06.2014 |
Adresa: |
41201, 2900556, Litoměřice, Litoměřice, Předměstí, Pražská, 531, 12, Pražská 531/12, Předměstí, 41201 Litoměřice |
|
Petr Žatecký
|
Neaktivní
od 10.06.2014
|
Jednatel |
17.09.2004 |
Adresa: |
41002, 16681185, Chotěšov, 121 |
|
Petr Žatecký
|
Neaktivní
od 10.06.2014
|
Jednatel |
17.09.2004 |
Adresa: |
41002, 16681185, Litoměřice, Chotěšov, Chotěšov, Libochovická, 121, Libochovická 121, 41002 Chotěšov |
|