Ing. ŠÁRKA HRUBÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
06.12.2018 |
Adresa: |
28802, 40661768, Nymburk, Budiměřice, Budiměřice, 143 |
|
Ing. ŠÁRKA HRUBÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
06.12.2018 |
Adresa: |
28802, 40661768, Nymburk, Budiměřice, Budiměřice, 143, č.p. 143, 28802 Budiměřice |
|
Aleš Hrubý
|
Neaktivní
od 17.06.2016
|
jednatel |
23.03.2001 |
Adresa: |
1099931, Nymburk, Šlotava, 50 |
|
Ing. Šárka Hrubá
|
Neaktivní
od 06.12.2018
|
jednatel |
23.03.2001 |
Adresa: |
1099931, Nymburk, Šlotava, 50 |
|
Aleš Hrubý
|
Neaktivní
od 17.06.2016
|
jednatel |
23.03.2001 |
Adresa: |
28802, 1099931, Nymburk, Budiměřice, Šlotava, 50, Šlotava 50, 28802 Budiměřice |
|
Ing. ŠÁRKA HRUBÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 06.12.2018
|
jednatel |
23.03.2001 |
Adresa: |
28802, 1099931, Nymburk, Budiměřice, Šlotava, 50, Šlotava 50, 28802 Budiměřice |
|
Aleš Hrubý
|
Neaktivní
od 23.03.2001
|
jednatel |
15.09.1997 |
Adresa: |
21948046, Praha 4, Praha 4, Na Pankráci, 994/36 |
|
Tomáš Kožíšek
|
Neaktivní
od 23.03.2001
|
jednatel |
15.09.1997 |
Adresa: |
22368957, Praha 8, Praha 8, Taussigova, 1172/1 |
|
Aleš Hrubý
|
Neaktivní
od 23.03.2001
|
jednatel |
15.09.1997 |
Adresa: |
14000, 21948046, Praha, Nusle, Na Pankráci, 994, 36, Na Pankráci 994/36, Nusle, 14000 Praha 4 |
|
TOMÁŠ KOŽÍŠEK
|
Neaktivní
od 23.03.2001
|
jednatel |
15.09.1997 |
Adresa: |
18200, 22368957, Praha, Kobylisy, Taussigova, 1172, 1, Taussigova 1172/1, Kobylisy, 18200 Praha 8 |
|