MARTA MICHÁLKOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
09.06.2021 |
Adresa: |
25261, 12770523, Praha-západ, Jeneč, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64 |
|
MARTA MICHÁLKOVÁ
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
09.06.2021 |
Adresa: |
25261, 12770523, Praha-západ, Jeneč, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64, Karlovarská 64, 25261 Jeneč |
|
Marta Michálková
|
Neaktivní
od 09.06.2021
|
jednatel |
05.01.2007 |
Adresa: |
25261, 12770523, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64 |
|
MARTA MICHÁLKOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 09.06.2021
|
jednatel |
05.01.2007 |
Adresa: |
25261, 12770523, Praha-západ, Jeneč, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64, Karlovarská 64, 25261 Jeneč |
|
Josef Michálek
|
Neaktivní
od 05.01.2007
|
jednatel |
14.10.2005 |
Adresa: |
25261, 12770523, Praha-západ, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64 |
|
Josef Michálek
|
Neaktivní
od 05.01.2007
|
jednatel |
14.10.2005 |
Adresa: |
25261, 12770523, Praha-západ, Jeneč, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64, Karlovarská 64, 25261 Jeneč |
|
Josef Michálek
|
Neaktivní
od 14.10.2005
|
jednatel |
05.02.1999 |
Adresa: |
12770523, Praha-západ, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64 |
|
Josef Michálek
|
Neaktivní
od 14.10.2005
|
jednatel |
05.02.1999 |
Adresa: |
25261, 12770523, Praha-západ, Jeneč, Jeneč, Karlovarská, 64, Karlovarská 64, 25261 Jeneč |
|