JESSE JACOB GEIGER
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
11.08.2021 |
Adresa: |
45140, Ohio, 9 Rose Lane Farm Loveland |
|
JESSE JACOB GEIGER
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
11.08.2021 |
Adresa: |
Ohio, 9 Rose Lane Farm Loveland, 45140, 9 Rose Lane Farm Loveland, 45140 Ohio, Spojené státy americké |
|
Dr. AUGUST JAMES TROENDLE
|
Neaktivní
od 11.08.2021
|
jednatel |
14.11.2017 |
Adresa: |
32963, Florida, Vero Beach, 1492 Corona Lane |
|
Dr. AUGUST JAMES TROENDLE
|
Neaktivní
od 11.08.2021
|
jednatel |
14.11.2017 |
Adresa: |
Florida, Vero Beach, 1492 Corona Lane, 32963, 1492 Corona Lane, 32963 Florida, Vero Beach, Spojené státy americké |
|
Petr Potužník
|
Neaktivní
od 11.08.2010
|
jednatel |
02.12.2009 |
Adresa: |
15500, Praha, Praha 5, Klausova, 24 |
|
Petr Potužník
|
Neaktivní
od 11.08.2010
|
jednatel |
02.12.2009 |
Adresa: |
15500, 26269686, Praha, Stodůlky, Klausova, 1460, 24, Klausova 1460/24, Stodůlky, 15500 Praha 5 |
|
Dr. August James Troendle
|
Neaktivní
od 14.11.2017
|
jednatel |
22.08.2007 |
Adresa: |
Cincinnati, Chidester Lane 4366, 45241 |
|
MUDr. Petr Potužník
|
Neaktivní
od 22.08.2007
|
jednatel |
22.08.2002 |
Adresa: |
22096175, Praha 5, Praha 5, Xaveriova, 54 |
|
MUDr. Petr Potužník
|
Neaktivní
od 22.08.2007
|
jednatel |
22.08.2002 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22096175, Praha, Smíchov, Xaveriova, 1954, 54, Xaveriova 1954/54, Smíchov, 15000 Praha 5 |
|
Slavomír Lokvenc
|
Neaktivní
od 22.08.2002
|
jednatel |
19.01.2000 |
Adresa: |
6864899, Domažlice, Srby, Polžice, 42 |
|
Slavomír Lokvenc
|
Neaktivní
od 22.08.2002
|
jednatel |
19.01.2000 |
Adresa: |
34601, 6864899, Domažlice, Srby, Polžice, 42, Polžice 42, 34601 Srby |
|