Thomas Launcelot Morgan
|
Neaktivní
od 23.07.2003
|
jednatel |
06.11.2002 |
Adresa: |
14000, 21809992, Praha 4, Praha 4, Gončarenkova, 1302/46 |
|
Thomas Launcelot Morgan
|
Neaktivní
od 23.07.2003
|
jednatel |
06.11.2002 |
Adresa: |
14700, 21809992, Praha, Braník, Gončarenkova, 1302, 46, Gončarenkova 1302/46, Braník, 14700 Praha 4 |
|
Thomas Launcelot Morgan
|
Neaktivní
od 06.11.2002
|
jednatel |
02.07.2001 |
Adresa: |
14000, 5, Praha 4, Praha 4, Na Klaudiánce, 6 |
|
Thomas Launcelot Morgan
|
Neaktivní
od 06.11.2002
|
jednatel |
02.07.2001 |
Adresa: |
14700, 21959439, Praha, Podolí, Na Klaudiánce, 47, 6, Na Klaudiánce 47/6, Podolí, 14700 Praha 4 |
|
Andrew Oliver
|
Neaktivní
od 22.05.2002
|
jednatel |
18.04.2001 |
Adresa: |
10000, 3, Praha 10, Praha 10, Bramboříkova, 1/2996 |
|
Andrew Oliver
|
Neaktivní
od 22.05.2002
|
jednatel |
18.04.2001 |
Adresa: |
10600, 22687432, Praha, Záběhlice, Bramboříková, 2996, 1, Bramboříková 2996/1, Záběhlice, 10600 Praha 10 |
|
Ingmar Cornelis Franciscus Johannes Booij
|
Neaktivní
od 18.04.2001
|
jednatel |
16.08.2000 |
Adresa: |
15000, 22771697, Praha 5, Praha 5, Voskovcova, 1075/41 |
|
Ingmar Cornelis Franciscus Johannes Booij
|
Neaktivní
od 18.04.2001
|
jednatel |
16.08.2000 |
Adresa: |
15200, 22771697, Praha, Hlubočepy, Voskovcova, 1075, 41, Voskovcova 1075/41, Hlubočepy, 15200 Praha 5 |
|
Petr Ježek
|
Neaktivní
od 16.08.2000
|
jednatel |
29.03.2000 |
Adresa: |
21949255, Praha 4, Praha 4, Lomnického, 1123/2 |
|
Petr Ježek
|
Neaktivní
od 16.08.2000
|
jednatel |
29.03.2000 |
Adresa: |
14000, 21949255, Praha, Nusle, Lomnického, 1123, 2, Lomnického 1123/2, Nusle, 14000 Praha 4 |
|