Ing. VJAČESLAV ANNENKOV
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
16.07.2020 |
Adresa: |
36005, 20685980, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Rybáře, Sokolovská, 289, 127 |
|
Ing. VJAČESLAV ANNENKOV
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
16.07.2020 |
Adresa: |
36005, 20685980, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Rybáře, Sokolovská, 289, 127, Sokolovská 289/127, Rybáře, 36005 Karlovy Vary |
|
Ing. VJAČESLAV ANNENKOV
|
Neaktivní
od 16.07.2020
|
jednatel |
14.09.2018 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20733691, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, I. P. Pavlova, 441, 27 |
|
Ing. VJAČESLAV ANNENKOV
|
Neaktivní
od 16.07.2020
|
jednatel |
14.09.2018 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20733691, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, I. P. Pavlova, 441, 27, I. P. Pavlova 441/27, 36001 Karlovy Vary |
|
Ing. VJAČESLAV ANNENKOV
|
Neaktivní
od 14.09.2018
|
jednatel |
21.10.2016 |
Adresa: |
36005, 20685980, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Rybáře, Sokolovská, 289, 127 |
|
Ing. VJAČESLAV ANNENKOV
|
Neaktivní
od 14.09.2018
|
jednatel |
21.10.2016 |
Adresa: |
36005, 20685980, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Rybáře, Sokolovská, 289, 127, Sokolovská 289/127, Rybáře, 36005 Karlovy Vary |
|
ing. Vjačeslav Annenkov
|
Neaktivní
od 21.10.2016
|
jednatel |
28.08.2008 |
Adresa: |
36020, 20727381, Karlovy Vary, Vrchlického, 356/19 |
|
ing. Vjačeslav Annenkov
|
Neaktivní
od 21.10.2016
|
jednatel |
28.08.2008 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20727381, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Drahovice, Vrchlického, 356, 19, Vrchlického 356/19, Drahovice, 36001 Karlovy Vary |
|
Ing. Vjačeslav Annenkov
|
Neaktivní
od 28.08.2008
|
jednatel |
21.05.2003 |
Adresa: |
20688938, Karlovy Vary, Majakovského, 694/11 |
|
Ing. Vjačeslav Annenkov
|
Neaktivní
od 28.08.2008
|
jednatel |
21.05.2003 |
Adresa: |
36005, 20688938, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Rybáře, Majakovského, 694, 11, Majakovského 694/11, Rybáře, 36005 Karlovy Vary |
|