Alexandra Ann Bennett
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
30.01.2009 |
Adresa: |
2110, Sydney, New South Wales, Hunters Hill, Alexandra St., 65 |
|
Rowena Kirsten Eve Talacko
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
30.01.2009 |
Adresa: |
2037, Sydney, New South Wales, Glebe, Avenue Rd., 23 |
|
Martin Thorburn Jan Talacko
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
30.01.2009 |
Adresa: |
2064, Sydney, New SOuth Wales, Atarmon, Stafford Rd., 43 |
|
Alexandra Ann Bennett
|
Neaktivní
od 12.05.2023
|
jednatel |
30.01.2009 |
Adresa: |
65, Sydney, New South Wales, Hunters Hill, Alexandra St., 2110, Alexandra St. 65, 2110 Sydney, New South Wales - Hunters Hill, Austrálie |
|
Rowena Kirsten Eve Talacko
|
Neaktivní
od 12.05.2023
|
jednatel |
30.01.2009 |
Adresa: |
23, Sydney, New South Wales, Glebe, Avenue Rd., 2037, Avenue Rd. 23, 2037 Sydney, New South Wales - Glebe, Austrálie |
|
Martin Thorburn Jan Talacko
|
Neaktivní
od 12.05.2023
|
jednatel |
30.01.2009 |
Adresa: |
43, Sydney, New SOuth Wales, Atarmon, Stafford Rd., 2064, Stafford Rd. 43, 2064 Sydney, New SOuth Wales - Atarmon, Austrálie |
|
Mgr. Marek Svoboda
|
Neaktivní
od 30.01.2009
|
jednatel |
12.11.2003 |
Adresa: |
12800, 21759260, Praha 2, Vyšehrad, Neklanova, 145/14 |
|
Mgr. Marek Svoboda
|
Neaktivní
od 30.01.2009
|
jednatel |
12.11.2003 |
Adresa: |
12800, 21759260, Praha, Vyšehrad, Neklanova, 145, 14, Neklanova 145/14, Vyšehrad, 12800 Praha 2 |
|
Pavla Smetanová
|
Neaktivní
od 12.11.2003
|
jednatel |
03.02.2003 |
Adresa: |
16300, 22249834, Praha 6, Praha 6, Brunnerova, 993/14 |
|
Pavla Smetanová
|
Neaktivní
od 12.11.2003
|
jednatel |
03.02.2003 |
Adresa: |
16300, 22249834, Praha, Řepy, Brunnerova, 993, 14, Brunnerova 993/14, Řepy, 16300 Praha 6 |
|