Todor Veselinov Vasilev
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
22.09.2023 |
Adresa: |
14200, 22694102, Praha, Krč, Za dvorem, 1776, 4, Za dvorem 1776/4, Krč, 14200 Praha 4 |
|
Stoyan Stefanov Stanchev
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
03.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
16300, 22251626, Praha 6, Řepy, Makovského, 1177/1 |
|
Todor Veselinov Vasilev
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
03.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
14200, 22694102, Praha 4, Krč, Za Dvorem, 1776/4 |
|
Stoyan Stefanov Stanchev
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
03.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
16300, 22251626, Praha, Řepy, Makovského, 1177, 1, Makovského 1177/1, Řepy, 16300 Praha 6 |
|
Hazem Awad
|
Neaktivní
od 25.07.2012
|
jednatel |
03.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
22711481, Praha 5, Petržílkova, 2260/26 |
|
Hazem Awad
|
Neaktivní
od 25.07.2012
|
jednatel |
03.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
15800, 22711481, Praha, Stodůlky, Petržílkova, 2260, 26, Petržílkova 2260/26, Stodůlky, 15800 Praha 5 |
|
Todor Veselinov Vasilev
|
Neaktivní
od 22.09.2023
|
jednatel |
03.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
14200, 22694102, Praha, Krč, Za dvorem, 1776, 4, Za dvorem 1776/4, Krč, 14200 Praha 4 |
|
Stoyan Stefanov Stanchev
|
Neaktivní
od 03.02.2010
|
jednatel |
21.01.2008 |
Adresa: |
7238975, Česká Skalice, Sportovní, 148 |
|
Hazem Awad
|
Neaktivní
od 03.02.2010
|
jednatel |
21.01.2008 |
Adresa: |
22711481, Praha 5, Petržílkova, 2260/26 |
|
Stoyan Stefanov Stanchev
|
Neaktivní
od 03.02.2010
|
jednatel |
21.01.2008 |
Adresa: |
55203, 7238975, Náchod, Česká Skalice, Česká Skalice, Sportovní, 148, Sportovní 148, 55203 Česká Skalice |
|
Hazem Awad
|
Neaktivní
od 03.02.2010
|
jednatel |
21.01.2008 |
Adresa: |
15800, 22711481, Praha, Stodůlky, Petržílkova, 2260, 26, Petržílkova 2260/26, Stodůlky, 15800 Praha 5 |
|