TOMÁŠ MELICHAR
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
01.09.2021 |
Adresa: |
26101, 23019701, Příbram, Příbram, Příbram VIII, Školní, 71 |
|
TOMÁŠ MELICHAR
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
01.09.2021 |
Adresa: |
26101, 23019701, Příbram, Příbram, Příbram VIII, Školní, 71, Školní 71, Příbram VIII, 26101 Příbram |
|
JIŘÍ PUCHERNA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
17.04.2016 |
Adresa: |
26101, 23006927, Příbram, Příbram, Příbram V-Zdaboř, Družstevní, 275 |
|
JIŘÍ PUCHERNA
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
17.04.2016 |
Adresa: |
26101, 23006927, Příbram, Příbram, Příbram V-Zdaboř, Družstevní, 275, Družstevní 275, Příbram V-Zdaboř, 26101 Příbram |
|
Jiří Pucherna
|
Neaktivní
od 17.04.2016
|
jednatel |
25.08.2008 |
Adresa: |
26101, Příbram V, Zdaboř, Družstevní, 275 |
|
JIŘÍ PUCHERNA
|
Neaktivní
od 17.04.2016
|
jednatel |
25.08.2008 |
Adresa: |
26101, 23006927, Příbram, Příbram, Příbram V-Zdaboř, Družstevní, 275, Družstevní 275, Příbram V-Zdaboř, 26101 Příbram |
|
Tomáš Melichar
|
Neaktivní
od 01.09.2021
|
jednatel |
11.06.2008 |
Adresa: |
26101, 22935355, Příbram, Orlov, 8 |
|
Tomáš Melichar
|
Neaktivní
od 01.09.2021
|
jednatel |
11.06.2008 |
Adresa: |
26101, 22935355, Příbram, Příbram, Orlov, 8, Orlov 8, 26101 Příbram |
|