OSDK a.s. v likvidaci
29012813 |
Neaktivní
od 05.05.2021
|
jednatel |
15.06.2019 |
Adresa: |
14800, 21847827, Praha 4, Chodov, Hvožďanská, 2237/5 |
|
OSDK a.s. v likvidaci
29012813 |
Neaktivní
od 05.05.2021
|
jednatel |
15.06.2019 |
Adresa: |
14800, 21847827, Praha, Chodov, Hvožďanská, 2237, 5, Hvožďanská 2237/5, Chodov, 14800 Praha 4 |
|
OSDK a.s.
29012813 |
Neaktivní
od 15.06.2019
|
jednatel |
01.09.2016 |
Adresa: |
14800, 21847827, Praha 4, Chodov, Hvožďanská, 2237/5 |
|
OSDK a.s.
29012813 |
Neaktivní
od 15.06.2019
|
jednatel |
01.09.2016 |
Adresa: |
14800, 21847827, Praha, Chodov, Hvožďanská, 2237, 5, Hvožďanská 2237/5, Chodov, 14800 Praha 4 |
|
Filip Kašík
|
Neaktivní
od 01.09.2016
|
jednatel |
21.11.2012 |
Adresa: |
12000, 21742057, Praha 2, Vinohrady, Lublaňská, 267, 12 |
|
Filip Kašík
|
Neaktivní
od 01.09.2016
|
jednatel |
21.11.2012 |
Adresa: |
12000, 21742057, Praha, Vinohrady, Lublaňská, 267, 12, Lublaňská 267/12, Vinohrady, 12000 Praha 2 |
|
Michal Huml
|
Neaktivní
od 21.11.2012
|
jednatel |
29.07.2008 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21769834, Praha 3, Žižkov, Roháčova, 44/299 |
|
Michal Huml
|
Neaktivní
od 21.11.2012
|
jednatel |
29.07.2008 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21769834, Praha, Žižkov, Roháčova, 299, 44, Roháčova 299/44, Žižkov, 13000 Praha 3 |
|
JUDr. Petr Madaj
|
Neaktivní
od 29.07.2008
|
jednatel |
09.07.2008 |
Adresa: |
14800, 22690646, Praha 4, Chodov, Kloboukova, 2226/28 |
|
JUDr. Petr Madaj
|
Neaktivní
od 29.07.2008
|
jednatel |
09.07.2008 |
Adresa: |
14800, 22690646, Praha, Chodov, Kloboukova, 2226, 28, Kloboukova 2226/28, Chodov, 14800 Praha 4 |
|