HALLU GI investment a.s. v likvidaci
29098971 |
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
30.08.2020 |
Adresa: |
10200, 27650162, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Hostivař, náměstí Přátelství, 1518, 2 |
|
HALLU GI investment a.s. v likvidaci
29098971 |
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
30.08.2020 |
Adresa: |
10200, 27650162, Praha, Hostivař, náměstí Přátelství, 1518, 2, náměstí Přátelství 1518/2, Hostivař, 10200 Praha 10 |
|
HALLU GI investment a.s.
29098971 |
Neaktivní
od 30.08.2020
|
jednatel |
12.04.2017 |
Adresa: |
10200, 27650162, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Hostivař, náměstí Přátelství, 1518, 2 |
|
HALLU GI investment a.s.
29098971 |
Neaktivní
od 30.08.2020
|
jednatel |
12.04.2017 |
Adresa: |
10200, 27650162, Praha, Hostivař, náměstí Přátelství, 1518, 2, náměstí Přátelství 1518/2, Hostivař, 10200 Praha 10 |
|
JAKUB ŠTRAUS
|
Neaktivní
od 12.04.2017
|
Jednatel |
02.07.2014 |
Adresa: |
58001, 9606165, Havlíčkův Brod, Havlíčkův Brod, Reynkova, 2107 |
|
JAKUB ŠTRAUS
|
Neaktivní
od 12.04.2017
|
Jednatel |
02.07.2014 |
Adresa: |
58001, 9606165, Havlíčkův Brod, Havlíčkův Brod, Havlíčkův Brod, Reynkova, 2107, Reynkova 2107, 58001 Havlíčkův Brod |
|
Pavel Suchý
|
Neaktivní
od 02.07.2014
|
jednatel |
18.01.2012 |
Adresa: |
58001, Havlíčkův Brod, Žižkova, 652 |
|
Pavel Suchý
|
Neaktivní
od 02.07.2014
|
jednatel |
18.01.2012 |
Adresa: |
58001, 9594485, Havlíčkův Brod, Havlíčkův Brod, Havlíčkův Brod, Žižkova, 652, Žižkova 652, 58001 Havlíčkův Brod |
|