Concrete Trade s.r.o. v likvidaci
28960611 |
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
14.10.2021 |
Adresa: |
10900, 22563326, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Horní Měcholupy, Na křečku, 365, 5 |
|
Concrete Trade s.r.o. v likvidaci
28960611 |
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
14.10.2021 |
Adresa: |
10900, 22563326, Praha, Horní Měcholupy, Na křečku, 365, 5, Na křečku 365/5, Horní Měcholupy, 10900 Praha 10 |
|
Concrete Trade s.r.o.
28960611 |
Neaktivní
od 14.10.2021
|
jednatel |
20.05.2015 |
Adresa: |
10900, 22563326, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Horní Měcholupy, Na křečku, 365, 5 |
|
Concrete Trade s.r.o.
28960611 |
Neaktivní
od 14.10.2021
|
jednatel |
20.05.2015 |
Adresa: |
10900, 22563326, Praha, Horní Měcholupy, Na křečku, 365, 5, Na křečku 365/5, Horní Měcholupy, 10900 Praha 10 |
|
Concrete Trade s.r.o.
28960611 |
Neaktivní
od 20.05.2015
|
jednatel |
25.04.2015 |
Adresa: |
10900, 22563326, Praha 10, Horní Měcholupy, Na Křečku, 365 |
|
Concrete Trade s.r.o.
28960611 |
Neaktivní
od 20.05.2015
|
jednatel |
25.04.2015 |
Adresa: |
10900, 22563326, Praha, Horní Měcholupy, Na křečku, 365, 5, Na křečku 365/5, Horní Měcholupy, 10900 Praha 10 |
|
OLDŘICH ŠLAPÁNEK
|
Neaktivní
od 25.04.2015
|
jednatel |
28.05.2013 |
Adresa: |
25219, 6350135, Rudná, Rudná, Masarykova, 696, 136 |
|
SVATAVA ŠLAPÁNKOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 25.04.2015
|
jednatel |
28.05.2013 |
Adresa: |
25216, 6544398, Nučice, Nučice, Sokolská, 331 |
|
OLDŘICH ŠLAPÁNEK
|
Neaktivní
od 25.04.2015
|
jednatel |
28.05.2013 |
Adresa: |
25219, 6350135, Praha-západ, Rudná, Rudná, Masarykova, 696, 136, Masarykova 696/136, 25219 Rudná |
|
SVATAVA ŠLAPÁNKOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 25.04.2015
|
jednatel |
28.05.2013 |
Adresa: |
25216, 6544398, Praha-západ, Nučice, Nučice, Sokolská, 331, Sokolská 331, 25216 Nučice |
|
Martin Ovčiak
|
Neaktivní
od 28.05.2013
|
jednatel |
03.12.2012 |
Adresa: |
25301, 26303060, Hostivice, Hostivice, Cedrová, 1970 |
|
Martin Ovčiak
|
Neaktivní
od 28.05.2013
|
jednatel |
03.12.2012 |
Adresa: |
25301, 26303060, Praha-západ, Hostivice, Hostivice, Cedrová, 1970, Cedrová 1970, 25301 Hostivice |
|
Mgr. Jan Lustig
|
Neaktivní
od 03.12.2012
|
jednatel |
08.10.2012 |
Adresa: |
16900, 22173331, Praha 6, Břevnov, Moravanů, 2153, 37 |
|
Mgr. Jan Lustig
|
Neaktivní
od 03.12.2012
|
jednatel |
08.10.2012 |
Adresa: |
16900, 22173331, Praha, Břevnov, Moravanů, 2153, 37, Moravanů 2153/37, Břevnov, 16900 Praha 6 |
|