Corporate Consulting a.s.
27395693 |
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
26.03.2021 |
Adresa: |
18600, 27783839, Praha 8, Karlín, Karolinská, 661 |
|
Corporate Consulting a.s.
27395693 |
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
26.03.2021 |
Adresa: |
18600, 27783839, Praha, Karlín, Karolinská, 661, 4, Karolinská 661/4, Karlín, 18600 Praha 8 |
|
BARBORA BRÜHLOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 26.03.2021
|
jednatel |
11.11.2020 |
Adresa: |
58601, 12342963, Jihlava, Jihlava, Jihlava, Komenského, 1372, 40 |
|
BARBORA BRÜHLOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 26.03.2021
|
jednatel |
11.11.2020 |
Adresa: |
58601, 12342963, Jihlava, Jihlava, Jihlava, Komenského, 1372, 40, Komenského 1372/40, 58601 Jihlava |
|
BARBORA BRÜHLOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 11.11.2020
|
jednatel |
31.05.2013 |
Adresa: |
19800, 27907643, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Kyje, Sicherova, 1606, 11 |
|
BARBORA BRÜHLOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 11.11.2020
|
jednatel |
31.05.2013 |
Adresa: |
19800, 27907643, Praha, Kyje, Sicherova, 1606, 11, Sicherova 1606/11, Kyje, 19800 Praha 9 |
|
Barbora Brühlová
|
Neaktivní
od 31.05.2013
|
jednatel |
11.10.2010 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21759511, Praha 3, Vinohradská, 111, 109 |
|
Barbora Brühlová
|
Neaktivní
od 31.05.2013
|
jednatel |
11.10.2010 |
Adresa: |
13000, 21759511, Praha, Vinohrady, Vinohradská, 111, 109, Vinohradská 111/109, Vinohrady, 13000 Praha 3 |
|
Rudolf Mašata
|
Neaktivní
od 11.10.2010
|
jednatel |
11.05.2010 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20743491, Karlovy Vary, Alšova, 1574, 8 |
|
RUDOLF MAŠATA
|
Neaktivní
od 11.10.2010
|
jednatel |
11.05.2010 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20743491, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Alšova, 1574, 8, Alšova 1574/8, 36001 Karlovy Vary |
|
Martina Vránová
|
Neaktivní
od 11.05.2010
|
jednatel |
19.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
36010, 20689501, Karlovy Vary, Chomutovská, 752/16 |
|
MARTINA VRÁNOVÁ
|
Neaktivní
od 11.05.2010
|
jednatel |
19.02.2010 |
Adresa: |
36010, 20689501, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Rybáře, Chomutovská, 752, 16, Chomutovská 752/16, Rybáře, 36010 Karlovy Vary |
|