supreme capital s.r.o.
09046615 |
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
16.07.2021 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22650822, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Vinohrady, Korunní, 1208, 74 |
|
supreme capital s.r.o.
09046615 |
Aktivní
|
Jednatel |
16.07.2021 |
Adresa: |
10100, 22650822, Praha, Vinohrady, Korunní, 1208, 74, Korunní 1208/74, Vinohrady, 10100 Praha 10 |
|
SPA Hotel Management Group SA
|
Neaktivní
od 29.05.2021
|
jednatel |
24.06.2015 |
Adresa: |
5405, Baden - Dätwill, Husmatt 1 |
|
SPA Hotel Management Group SA
|
Neaktivní
od 29.05.2021
|
jednatel |
24.06.2015 |
Adresa: |
Baden - Dätwill, Husmatt 1, 5405, Husmatt 1, 5405 Baden - Dätwill, Švýcarsko |
|
JAN MOTLÍK
|
Neaktivní
od 24.06.2015
|
Jednatel |
12.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20695900, Karlovy Vary, Olšová Vrata, Ke Golfu, 111 |
|
JAN MOTLÍK
|
Neaktivní
od 24.06.2015
|
Jednatel |
12.09.2014 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20695900, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Olšová Vrata, Ke Golfu, 111, Ke Golfu 111, Olšová Vrata, 36001 Karlovy Vary |
|
JAN MOTLÍK
|
Neaktivní
od 12.09.2014
|
Jednatel |
14.12.2012 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20695900, Karlovy Vary, Olšová Vrata, Ke Golfu, 111 |
|
JAN MOTLÍK
|
Neaktivní
od 12.09.2014
|
Jednatel |
14.12.2012 |
Adresa: |
36001, 20695900, Karlovy Vary, Karlovy Vary, Olšová Vrata, Ke Golfu, 111, Ke Golfu 111, Olšová Vrata, 36001 Karlovy Vary |
|