Ing. MILAN KRYST
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
05.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
78316, 16103726, Dolany, Dolany, 421 |
|
Ing. MILAN KRYST
|
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
05.11.2015 |
Adresa: |
78316, 16103726, Olomouc, Dolany, Dolany, 421, č.p. 421, 78316 Dolany |
|
Ing. Milan Kryst
|
Neaktivní
od 05.11.2015
|
jednatel |
08.09.2008 |
Adresa: |
78316, 16103726, Dolany, 421 |
|
Ing. MILAN KRYST
|
Neaktivní
od 05.11.2015
|
jednatel |
08.09.2008 |
Adresa: |
78316, 16103726, Olomouc, Dolany, Dolany, 421, č.p. 421, 78316 Dolany |
|
Jiřina Chuchlerová
|
Neaktivní
od 08.09.2008
|
jednatel |
24.03.2004 |
Adresa: |
25489801, Praha 10, Omská, 51 |
|
Ing. Milan Kryst
|
Neaktivní
od 08.09.2008
|
jednatel |
24.03.2004 |
Adresa: |
23309270, Olomouc, Stiborova, 3 |
|
Jiřina Chuchlerová
|
Neaktivní
od 08.09.2008
|
jednatel |
24.03.2004 |
Adresa: |
10000, 25489801, Praha, Vršovice, Omská, 1511, 51, Omská 1511/51, Vršovice, 10000 Praha 10 |
|
Ing. Milan Kryst
|
Neaktivní
od 08.09.2008
|
jednatel |
24.03.2004 |
Adresa: |
77900, 23309270, Olomouc, Olomouc, Nová Ulice, Stiborova, 884, 3, Stiborova 884/3, Nová Ulice, 77900 Olomouc |
|
Madla Fiurášková
|
Neaktivní
od 24.03.2004
|
Jednatel |
25.11.1992 |
Adresa: |
22222, 21818908, Praha 4, Plickova, 553 |
|
Věra Peková
|
Neaktivní
od 24.03.2004
|
Jednatel |
25.11.1992 |
Adresa: |
14900, Praha 4, Blažovského, 879 |
|
ing. Vladimír Peka
|
Neaktivní
od 24.03.2004
|
Jednatel |
25.11.1992 |
Adresa: |
14900, Praha 4, Blažovského, 879 |
|
Madla Fiurášková
|
Neaktivní
od 24.03.2004
|
Jednatel |
25.11.1992 |
Adresa: |
14900, 21818908, Praha, Háje, Plickova, 553, 21, Plickova 553/21, Háje, 14900 Praha 4 |
|
Věra Peková
|
Neaktivní
od 24.03.2004
|
Jednatel |
25.11.1992 |
Adresa: |
879, Praha 4, Blažovského, 14900, Blažovského 879, 14900 Praha 4, Česká republika |
|
ing. Vladimír Peka
|
Neaktivní
od 24.03.2004
|
Jednatel |
25.11.1992 |
Adresa: |
879, Praha 4, Blažovského, 14900, Blažovského 879, 14900 Praha 4, Česká republika |
|