SWISS VALUE ASSETS(ČR) s.r.o. v likvidaci
25534505 |
Aktivní
|
jednatel |
30.06.2017 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21706387, Praha 1, Nové Město, Václavské nám., 832/19 |
|
SWISS VALUE ASSETS(ČR) s.r.o. v likvidaci
25534505 |
Neaktivní
od 17.03.2023
|
jednatel |
30.06.2017 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21706387, Praha, Nové Město, Václavské náměstí, 832, 19, Václavské náměstí 832/19, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|
SWISS VALUE ASSETS(ČR) s.r.o.
25534505 |
Neaktivní
od 30.06.2017
|
jednatel |
12.04.2017 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21706387, Praha 1, Nové Město, Václavské nám., 832/19 |
|
SWISS VALUE ASSETS(ČR) s.r.o.
25534505 |
Neaktivní
od 30.06.2017
|
jednatel |
12.04.2017 |
Adresa: |
11000, 21706387, Praha, Nové Město, Václavské náměstí, 832, 19, Václavské náměstí 832/19, Nové Město, 11000 Praha 1 |
|
CONSTANTIN CIUNTU
|
Neaktivní
od 12.04.2017
|
jednatel |
23.01.2017 |
Adresa: |
Iasi, Mihai Viteazu 11 |
|
CONSTANTIN CIUNTU
|
Neaktivní
od 12.04.2017
|
jednatel |
23.01.2017 |
Adresa: |
Iasi, Mihai Viteazu 11, Mihai Viteazu 11, Iasi, Rumunsko |
|
LUBOŠ KOŠNER
|
Neaktivní
od 23.01.2017
|
jednatel |
01.04.2014 |
Adresa: |
10200, 22575553, Hlavní město Praha, Praha, Hostivař, Chudenická, 1059, 30 |
|
LUBOŠ KOŠNER
|
Neaktivní
od 23.01.2017
|
jednatel |
01.04.2014 |
Adresa: |
10200, 22575553, Praha, Hostivař, Chudenická, 1059, 30, Chudenická 1059/30, Hostivař, 10200 Praha 10 |
|
Ing. Lubomír Horák
|
Neaktivní
od 04.10.2005
|
Jednatel |
10.08.1993 |
Adresa: |
41201, 2907020, Litoměřice, Čechova, 11 |
|
Ing. Vladimír Černý
|
Neaktivní
od 01.04.2014
|
Jednatel |
10.08.1993 |
Adresa: |
41301, 16855400, Roudnice nad Labem, Máchova, 260 |
|
Ing. Lubomír Horák
|
Neaktivní
od 04.10.2005
|
Jednatel |
10.08.1993 |
Adresa: |
41201, 2907020, Litoměřice, Litoměřice, Předměstí, Čechova, 1274, 11, Čechova 1274/11, Předměstí, 41201 Litoměřice |
|
Ing. Vladimír Černý
|
Neaktivní
od 01.04.2014
|
Jednatel |
10.08.1993 |
Adresa: |
41301, 16855400, Litoměřice, Roudnice nad Labem, Roudnice nad Labem, Máchova, 260, Máchova 260, 41301 Roudnice nad Labem |
|